DE SB154 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act establishes the Quality Improvement Advisory Council (Advisory Council) to promote collaboration and problem-solving with stakeholders in the system of care administered by the Division of Developmental Disabilities Services (the Division). The Division, in consultation with the Advisory Council, must submit an annual report to the General Assembly and the Department of Health and Social Services on specific performance measures affecting services to adults with intellectual and developmental disabilities.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Services For Adults With Intellectual And Developmental Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-26 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2019-06-25 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-06-25 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 154 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-20 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 154 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |