DE SB154 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Section 1 eliminates the need to use an ordinance to appoint a Town Manager and specifies that all departments, including the Police Department, report directly to the Town Manager.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of South Bethany.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-04-26 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-04-26 Amendment HA 1 to SB 154 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-04-26 Amendment HA 1 to SB 154 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2018-03-22 Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
2018-03-20 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-03-09 Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback