DE SB152 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Reported Out of Committee (Energy) in House with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Reported Out of Committee (Energy) in House with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act would facilitate EV and grid-integrated electric vehicle interconnection by including the Society of Automotive Engineers industrial safety standard, J3072, which sets safety requirements for EVs that provide power from their batteries back to the electric grid.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 26 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Generating Systems With The New Sae Electric Safety Standard.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Simpson [R] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] |
Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] | Sen. Harris McDowell [D] | Sen. Jack Walsh [D] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] |
Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Energy) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-18 | Assigned to Energy Committee in House | |
2018-04-17 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate |