DE SB151 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Birth control use is nearly universal among women of reproductive age in the United States and is a key part of preventative health care for women. Access to birth control provides health benefits for women and children, improves women's ability to control whether and when they have a child, and fosters women's ability to participate in education and the workforce. However, the cost of birth control, particularly the higher up-front costs of the more effective, longer-acting birth control methods, is often a barrier to women accessing the birth control they need.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18, Title 29, And Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance Coverage Of Contraceptives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-11 Signed by Governor
2018-06-28 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 2 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
2018-06-19 Re-Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2018-06-06 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
2018-06-05 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 NO
2018-06-05 Amendment SA 1 to SB 151 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-03-29 Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback