DE SB150 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 10 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act requires the Department of Education (Department) to establish a uniform kindergarten registration process. The Department must establish a uniform kindergarten registration process by the 2021 through 2022 school year and the school districts and charter schools must use the process beginning with the 2022 through 2023 school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Kindergarten Registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2019-06-26 Assigned to Education Committee in House
2019-06-25 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-06-25 Amendment SA 1 to SB 150 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-06-25 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2019-06-12 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2019-06-11 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback