DE SB150 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act reduces the membership on the Delaware Police Accreditation Commission from 16 members to 12 members. The Act also provides that: i) the Secretary of the Department of Safety and Homeland Security may not vote except to break a tie; and ii) members of the Commission may appoint a designee to serve in their stead and at their pleasure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Police Accreditation Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
2018-04-25 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2018-03-28 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2018-03-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2018-03-09 Introduced and Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback