DE SB150 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - SS 1 for SB 150 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill allows that penalties for violations of rules of the road are enhanced when a victim is vulnerable user (as defined) of a right-of-way who experiences serious physical injury. It expands vulnerable user protection from careless or inattentive driving violations to all rules of the road.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Rules Of The Road.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-30SenateSS 1 for SB 150 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-28SenateSubstituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 150
2016-04-12SenateReported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2015-06-23SenateAssigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback