DE SB150 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Joint Sunset Committee bill sunsets inactive Boards, Councils and Commissions. In the spring of 2008, the Joint Sunset Committee received a list of inactive Boards/Councils/Commissions from the Governor’s Office. The Committee notified each oversight agency that the Committee intended to sunset the inactive entity. Each agency responded to the Committee indicating that the entity was in fact inactive. The Committee also held a public hearing in regard to these entities.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14, Title 18, And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-06 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-06-24 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2009-06-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2009-06-17 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-17 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-17 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2009-06-11 | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2009-06-04 | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |