DE SB15 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill provides for gradual increases in the Delaware minimum wage to $15 over a period of several years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Minimum Wage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-19 Signed by Governor
2021-06-17 Passed By House. Votes: 26 YES 15 NO
2021-06-17 Amendment HA 9 to SB 15 - Defeated By House. Votes: 16 YES 25 NO
2021-06-17 Amendment HA 6 to SB 15 - Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 26 NO
2021-06-17 Amendment HA 5 to SB 15 - Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 26 NO
2021-06-17 Amendment HA 4 to SB 15 - Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 26 NO
2021-06-17 Amendment HA 3 to SB 15 - Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 26 NO
2021-06-17 Amendment HA 2 to SB 15 - Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 26 NO
2021-06-17 Amendment HA 1 to SB 15 - Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 26 NO
2021-06-15 Amendment HA 9 to SB 15 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-14 Amendment HA 8 to SB 15 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-14 Amendment HA 7 to SB 15 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-14 Amendment HA 6 to SB 15 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-14 Amendment HA 5 to SB 15 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-11 Amendment HA 4 to SB 15 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-11 Amendment HA 3 to SB 15 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-10 Amendment HA 2 to SB 15 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-10 Amendment HA 1 to SB 15 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-04 Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 4 Favorable
2021-04-22 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2021-04-22 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 6 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2021-03-18 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
2021-03-18 Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 7 NO
2021-03-18 Amendment SA 1 to SB 15 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 6 NO 1 ABSENT
2021-03-18 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 Favorable
2021-03-18 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2021-03-18 Amendment SA 1 to SB 15 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-03-17 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2021-03-09 Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback