DE SB149 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 6 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This legislation creates a fine for Coal Rolling, a practice that is often undetectable at the time of vehicle inspection due to the ability of an operator to change functions and increase emissions after passing inspection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Motor Vehicles, Operations And Equipment, Rules Of The Road, Miscellaneous Rules.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 6 On Its Merits
2018-03-22 Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House
2018-03-20 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-03-15 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2018-01-24 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback