DE SB147 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Immunity from liability for individuals rendering emergency care is addressed in many sections of the Delaware Code. There are several separate statutes providing immunity for specific professions and even for lay individuals providing specific types of assistance. Section 6715 of Title 16 provided immunity to Firemen, policemen or volunteer ambulance or rescue squad members rendering emergency care until it was transferred to ยง 6801 of Title 16 in 1971. Section 3001G of Title 16 provides immunity to peace officers who administer naloxone to an individual whom the officer believes is undergoing an opioid-related drug overdose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Exemptions From Liability For Individuals Rendering Emergency Care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2018-03-27 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2018-03-22 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-03-22 Amendment SA 1 to SB 147 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2018-03-08 Amendment SA 1 to SB 147 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-01-23 Introduced and Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback