DE SB146 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-30 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

The continued existence and dissemination of a juvenile criminal record hampers an individuals ability to become a successful and productive member of society. These criminal records are a hindrance to employment, education, housing, credit, and military service. This Act streamlines Delawares juvenile expungement code by providing the Delaware Family Court the option to immediately order an expungement in the event that a felony case was terminated in favor of the juvenile (i.e. a juvenile was found not guilty, or the charges were dropped). Delaware law currently allows the Court to do this for misdemeanor and violation cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Juvenile Expungments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-05-09 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2018-05-03 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2018-05-02 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-05-02 Amendment SA 2 to SB 146 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-05-02 Amendment SA 1 to SB 146 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-01-24 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-01-23 Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback