DE SB143 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill amends the membership of the Behavioral Health Consortium to include two members of both the House and Senate, a member from the Ability Network of Delaware, and the Mental Health Association in Delaware. The Bill also extends the date the first report is due from March 1, 2018 to April 16, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Establishment Of The Behavioral Health Consortium.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05 Signed by Governor
2018-03-29 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2018-03-01 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2018-01-25 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-01-24 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-01-24 Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 143, and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback