DE SB143 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-28 - SS 1 for SB 143 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-28 - SS 1 for SB 143 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Profession And Occupation Of Optometry.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Profession And Occupation Of Optometry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 143 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-22 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 143 - Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 143 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 143 - Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 143 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |