DE SB141 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
Pending: House Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Both the Delaware Strategic Fund (Title 29, Chapter 87A, Subchapter II) and the Delaware Technical Innovation Fund (Title 29, Chapter 87A, Subchapter III) provide funding for Delaware businesses, including new businesses in growing technology-related fields. The Delaware Strategic Fund is intended to assist in the development of startup strategies such as seed capital and incubator programs. The Delaware Technical Innovation Fund is intended to promote coordination with Delawares institutions of higher education and the private sector to commercialize innovative products and processes developed by small businesses. This act encourages Delawares institutions of higher education to assist foreign-born, student entrepreneurs, who are engaged in the development of new businesses and technologies in Delaware, to provide them with assistance in maintaining proper legal status within the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Economic Development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
2019-06-13 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2019-06-13 Amendment SA 1 to SB 141 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2019-06-12 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2019-06-11 Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback