DE SB139 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill changes the requirements for members to be appointed to the Delaware Emergency Medical Services Oversight Council. The bill also clarifies that a member may serve for a term of up to three years and is eligible for reappointment and the number of members needed to constitute a quorum. In addition, the bill allows for removal of a member by the Governor under certain circumstances and clarifies that the Council may adopt bylaws for adopting operating procedures. The bill also makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Emergency Medical Services Oversight Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-25 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 5 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-10 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2021-06-09 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |