DE SB139 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Enrolled on January 21 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

In an effort to ensure the safety and wellbeing of dogs, this legislation improves shelter and tether standards in hazardous weather conditions, including clarifying restrictions on outdoor housing and tethering for dogs during hazardous weather conditions that pose a serious adverse risk to the health and safety of dogs. This bill also aims to improve public safety by prohibiting dogs from running at-large without a leash in public outdoor settings, with the exception of working dogs and permits dogs off leash on private property or where property owner has given the dog owner permission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 And Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Cruelty To Dogs And Specifications For Humane Handling, Care And Treatment Of Dogs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23 Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT
2020-01-21 Passed By House. Votes: 33 YES 6 NO 2 ABSENT
2020-01-21 Amendment HA 5 to SB 139 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2020-01-21 Amendment HA 4 to SB 139 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2020-01-21 Amendment HA 3 to SB 139 - Defeated In House by Voice Vote
2020-01-21 Amendment HA 2 to SB 139 - Stricken in House
2020-01-21 Amendment HA 1 to SB 139 - Stricken in House
2020-01-21 Amendment HA 3 to SB 139 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2020-01-21 Amendment HA 2 to SB 139 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2019-06-27 Amendment HA 1 to SB 139 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-06-19 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2019-06-18 Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 5 NO 2 ABSENT
2019-06-18 Amendment SA 1 to SB 139 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2019-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2019-06-07 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback