DE SB139 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5)
Status: Passed on June 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act requires that health insurance offered in this State provide coverage for fertility care services, including in vitro fertilization ("IVF") procedures, for individuals who suffer from a disease or condition that results in the inability to procreate or to carry a pregnancy to a live birth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance Coverage For Obstetrical And Gynecological Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-30 Signed by Governor
2018-06-07 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 NO
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 2 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
2018-03-28 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2018-03-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-03-27 Amendment SA 2 to SB 139 - Stricken in Senate
2018-03-27 Amendment SA 1 to SB 139 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-03-16 Amendment SA 1 to SB 139 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 4 Favorable
2018-01-10 Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback