DE SB135 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act prohibits non-essential idling of locomotives between 8 p.m. and 7 a.m.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Locomotive Idling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 33 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 6 On Its Merits |
2015-06-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 13 YES 7 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate |