DE SB134 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would amend the insurance code to allow patients to assign their right to receive benefits under their health insurance policies to physicians and other health care providers. In addition, this bill would incorporate the provisions of Section 7.6 of Insurance Department Regulation 1301 into the insurance code.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Health Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-30 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2011-06-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-29 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-16 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2011-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2011-06-14 | Assigned to Insurance Committee in Senate |