DE SB131 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act lowers the tax rate for premium cigars from 30% to 15% of the wholesale price so that Delaware's tax rate is consistent with the tax rates for premium cigars in surrounding states. The tax rate in Maryland is 15% and there is no tax on premium cigars in Pennsylvania. Under this Act, a premium cigar means any roll for smoking that is all of the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Taxation Of Premium Cigars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2022-04-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-16 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House | |
2021-06-15 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 6 NO | |
2021-06-15 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 131 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 NO | |
2021-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-19 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2021-05-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2021-05-18 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 131 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-05-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |