DE SB130 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill restores the Board of Paroles authority to hear and make decisions regarding violations of offenders released through good time credits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Parole.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2018-03-20 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-03-20 Amendment SA 1 to SB 130 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-03-20 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-03-16 Amendment SA 1 to SB 130 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-06 Laid On Table in Senate
2017-06-29 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-27 Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback