DE SB130 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - SS 2 for SB 130 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 35 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - SS 2 for SB 130 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 35 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill defines criteria for any local government to promote economic development by entering into an agreement with the Department of Transportation to create transit-oriented development districts, called "Complete Community Enterprise Districts". Complete Community Enterprise Districts may be designated in downtown or urban core areas, traditional towns or villages, or regional activity centers. They are characterized by their mix of land uses, efficient use of public infrastructure, efficient use of public services and multiple modes of public transportation combined with environmentally friendly private transportation.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 2, Title 9 And Title 22 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Transportation And Land Use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | SS 2 for SB 130 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 35 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-04-20 | Senate | SS 2 for SB 130 - Reported Out of Committee (TRANSPORTATION/LAND USE AND INFRASTRUCTURE) in House with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2016-04-12 | Senate | SS 2 for SB 130 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 3 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 130 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ENERGY & TRANSIT) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Assigned to Energy & Transit Committee in Senate |