DE SB129 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill makes clear that farm equipment and implements of husbandry, including when being temporarily moved or transported by a manufacturer, dealer, business, or commercial transport company, shall not be subject to the weight requirements of Section 4502 and therefore not subject to overweight fees by the Secretary under Section 4504.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Overweight Farm Equipment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17 Signed by Governor
2018-03-20 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-01-17 Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 5 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2017-07-02 Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House
2017-06-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-30 Amendment SA 1 to SB 129 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2017-06-22 Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback