DE SB127 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This legislation corrects an inadvertent error in Delaware law that has permitted people younger than 18 years of age to vote in final-stage elections. People must be 18 years of age or older to be eligible to vote in a final-stage election such as general elections, special elections, school board elections, and school district referendums. However, people younger than 18 years of age can vote in any preliminary election, such as primary elections, if they will be 18 years of age at the time of the final-stage election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 15 Relating To Voter Registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-01-17 Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
2018-01-11 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-22 Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback