DE SB126 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act prescribes specific fines for violating § 4134 of Title 21. Previously, a violation of § 4134 would have been subject to the penalties outlined in § 4205 of Title 21. The amount of the penalties in § 4205 are as follows: for a first offense, a fine of not less than $25 nor more than $75. For each subsequent like offense, a fine of not less than $57.50 nor more than $95. Section 4205 is a general penalty provision that establishes penalties for violations of Chapter 41 of Title 21 or Chapter 42 of Title 21 in the event that the penalties are not otherwise prescribed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Operation Of Vehicles On Approach Of Authorized Emergency Vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2021-06-09 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2021-06-08 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2021-05-20 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
2021-05-05 Introduced and Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback