DE SB126 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act expands eligibility for Line-of-Duty disability benefits to paid firefighters who work for municipal fire departments and to fire service instructors and fire marshals who work for the State and for nonphysical disabilities.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Line-of-duty Disability Benefits To Covered Firefighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2019-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-21 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2019-06-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-20 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 126 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-31 | Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |