DE SB126 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act provides school-based speech-language pathologists and audiologists who hold a current Certificate of Clinical Competence in speech-language pathology, (CCC-SLP) or audiology (CCC-A), issued by the American Speech-Language and Hearing Association and who hold a current state license to practice from the Delaware Board of Speech Pathologists, Audiologists and Hearing Aid Dispensers with a base salary level of Masters Plus 30 credits. Professionals who have a CCC-SLP or CCC-A ASHA certification have met the following rigorous academic and professional standards:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Basic Salary Schedule For Teachers, Nurses, Principals, Superintendents, And Other Administrative And Supervisory Employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 1 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits
2018-06-13 Assigned to Education Committee in House
2018-06-12 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-02-20 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2018-01-17 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 Favorable
2017-06-21 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback