DE SB124 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Charter of the Town of Smyrna ("Charter") to clarify the authority of the Town in certain areas and to improve the operations of the Town. Specifically, in this Act:
Title
An Act To Amend The Town Charter Of The Town Of Smyrna.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. William Carson [D] | Sen. David Lawson [R] | Sen. David Sokola [D] |
Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Spiegelman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-18 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-14 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2021-05-13 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-05-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2021-04-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |