DE SB122 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Vetoed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act creates the Delaware Perinatal Quality Collaborative to improve pregnancy outcomes for women and newborns and such issues as obstetrical blood loss management, pregnant women with substance use disorder, infants impacted by neonatal abstinence syndrome, and advancing evidence-based clinical practices and processes through quality care review, audit, and continuous quality improvement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Perinatal Quality Collaborative.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-21 Vetoed by Governor
2019-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2019-06-19 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2019-06-12 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2019-06-11 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2019-06-05 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2019-06-05 was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 122

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback