DE SB122 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Title 14, Chapter 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Education And The Reorganization And Changing Of School District Boundaries.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14, Chapter 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Education And The Reorganization And Changing Of School District Boundaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 0 NO 3 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 11 On Its Merits |
2015-06-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |