DE SB122 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires that all Delaware Psychiatric Center employees providing direct care to patients be subject to criminal background checks and drug testing. The drug testing provides for both pre-employment testing and testing where reasonable suspicion that an individual is impaired by an illegal drug exists.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Criminal Background Checks And Mandatory Drug Testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-08 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-02 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2010-05-27 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2010-05-13 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-13 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-06 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2009-06-04 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |