DE SB120 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act authorizes the Division of Motor Vehicles to issue migratory shorebird special registration plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Special Registration Plates To Support Migratory Shorebirds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2020-06-26 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2019-06-26 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2019-06-19 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2019-06-18 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2019-06-12 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2019-05-29 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback