DE SB119 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - SS 1 for SB 119 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 28 YES 7 NO 0 NOT VOTING 6 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - SS 1 for SB 119 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 28 YES 7 NO 0 NOT VOTING 6 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This act will amend existing law by increasing the required minimum percentage of renewable energy supply to Delaware customers, such as solar, wind, geothermal, and hydroelectric power. The act achieves this goal by setting a minimum percentage of energy that must come from renewable resources at 30% by 2023. The act also creates a Distributed Renewable Energy carve out of 10% by 2023.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 26 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Renewable Energy Portfolio Standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | SS 1 for SB 119 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 28 YES 7 NO 0 NOT VOTING 6 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-23 | SS 1 for SB 119 - Reported Out of Committee (ENERGY) in House with 2 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-22 | SS 1 for SB 119 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-22 | SS 1 for SB 119 - Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2010-06-18 | SS 1 for SB 119 - Laid On Table in Senate | |
2010-06-18 | Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 119 | |
2009-06-17 | Reported Out of Committee (ENERGY & TRANSIT) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2009-06-16 | Assigned to Energy & Transit Committee in Senate |