DE SB118 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-25 - Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-25 - Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act revises the circumstances under which an applicant can be denied a license by the Real Estate Commission because of a criminal conviction. Similar to the recent changes made other professional license requirements, this Act does all of the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Real Estate Services, Brokers, Associate Brokers And Salespersons.
Sponsors
Sen. Darius Brown [D] | Rep. Andria Bennett [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Lockman [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] |
Sen. Jack Walsh [D] | Rep. Nnamdi Chukwuocha [D] | Rep. Lyndon Yearick [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-19 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2019-06-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |