DE SB117 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill allows a pellet gun, airbow, and most other air guns to be possessed and utilized for hunting in Delaware, however, it does not change the classification of airbows and higher powered air rifles as firearms. The bill also does not change that possession of weapons such as zip guns and other created weapons are illegal and listed as a dangerous weapon.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Dangerous Weapons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-10 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
2017-06-21 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2017-06-20 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-13 Introduced and Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback