DE SB115 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill adopts the emergency suspension provision already included in the Medical Practice Act for boards and commissions regulated under Titles 23 and 24 of the Delaware Code to enable a temporary suspension pending a hearing to be issued upon the written order of the Secretary of State or the Secretary’s designee, with the concurrence of the Board chair or the Board chair’s designee if the activity of the licensee presents a clear and immediate danger to the public health. This Bill will make current disparate emergency procedures more uniform across the boards.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 23 And 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating Professions And Occupations And Temporary Suspensions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 8 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-18 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-03-18 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2014-01-15 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits |
2013-06-27 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 13 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |