DE SB114 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act corrects a technical error in House Bill No. 311 of the 149th General Assembly. HB 311 was intended to allow the grandfathering of licenses under Chapter 39, Title 24 to occur up to 2 years after HB 311 was enacted. In fact, however, HB 311's effective date allowed for only 1 year. Under this Act, the grandfathering period will be for the intended period of 2 years.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Board Of Social Work Examiners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-06-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-20 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2019-06-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-29 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |