DE SB114 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act declassifies a number of minor violations associated with state parks by changing some violations from an unclassified misdemeanor to a class D environmental violation. As a result, the first offense of a class D environmental violation will not be reported on criminal history records provided by the State Bureau of Identification for employment purposes under 8513(c) of Title 11. Subsequent offenses will be reported for employment purposes. This Act shall become effective following the publication of final regulations consistent with this Act, or on April 1, 2016, whichever comes first. Finally, this Act makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the guidelines of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Violations Of Rules And Regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2015-06-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate |