DE SB113 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Amendment SA 1 to SB 113 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 10 NO
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill authorizes the creation of a Delaware Voluntary Property Assessed Clean Energy (D-PACE) program to establish a clean energy financing program for the installation of energy efficiency technologies and clean energy systems for qualifying commercial real properties statewide. PACE programs are authorized in more than 30 states nationwide. The financing will be secured by and payable from a voluntary assessment imposed on the property benefited by the qualifying energy improvement. The bill calls upon the Sustainable Energy Utility (SEU) to administer the program and establish a statewide financing program to aid counties in expanding clean energy projects in their jurisdictions. Projects under D-PACE can be financed through the SEU or other participating financial institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To A Delaware Voluntary Clean Energy Financing Program Through Local Government Assessments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26 Amendment SA 1 to SB 113 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 10 NO
2018-04-26 Laid On Table in Senate
2018-04-26 Amendment SA 1 to SB 113 - Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-04-26 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-01-25 Laid On Table in Senate
2018-01-25 Amendment SA 1 to SB 113 - Laid On Table in Senate
2018-01-25 Amendment SA 1 to SB 113 - Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-01-25 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-01-24 Amendment SA 3 to SB 113 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-01-24 Amendment SA 2 to SB 113 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-01-23 Laid On Table in Senate
2018-01-23 Amendment SA 1 to SB 113 - Laid On Table in Senate
2018-01-23 Lifted From Table in Senate
2017-06-27 Laid On Table in Senate
2017-06-27 Roll Call Rescinded in Senate
2017-06-27 Reconsidered in Senate
2017-06-27 Amendment SA 1 to SB 113 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-15 Defeated By Senate. Votes: 8 YES 6 NO 3 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-09 ReAssigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate
2017-06-08 Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback