DE SB111 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act creates an automatic expungement process for adult and juvenile charges that are eligible for mandatory expungement because under the petition-based system, only a small fraction of people eligible for expungement ever obtain this important relief. Under this Act, the State Bureau of Identification must identify and expunge cases eligible for automatic mandatory expungement on a monthly basis.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 And Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Automatic Expungement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 NO | |
2021-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-20 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2021-05-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2021-05-06 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2021-04-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-04-29 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2021-04-29 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2021-04-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-04-21 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2021-04-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-04-14 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |