DE SB110 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

The Joint Legislative Oversight and Sunset Committee approved a project to work with the Governor's Office throughout 2018 and 2019 to identify antiquated boards, commissions, and councils that need statutory updates or outright repeals. The Architectural Accessibility Board was identified as needing updates to make it easier to fill vacancies and generally update language to modern legislative drafting standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Architectural Accessibility Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-23 Signed by Governor
2019-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2019-06-25 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2019-06-20 Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
2019-06-19 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2019-06-05 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2019-05-29 Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback