DE SB11 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act relates to police and fire pension funds created under Title 18 of the Delaware Code. The General Assembly created a special fund in the hopes of ensuring adequate pensions for affected police officers and firefighters, and their surviving spouses. This has not come to pass with regard to all pensions, however. By way of example only, the average surviving spouse in the Wilmington Police and Fire retirement plan receives a pension of only $10,080, which is $1,090 dollars below the 2012 poverty level. Moreover, there have been only five disbursements under the special fund in its 48 year history. To address this, the Act would allow for an additional manner of providing distributions from the related special fund established for Police and Fire pensions. Specifically, disbursements from the fund to be made under this Act would be biennial and structured in 3 categories. The 3 categories are based upon length of retirement and whether the eligible individual is a surviving spouse or receiving a disability pension.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Special Funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-29 Signed by Governor
2018-06-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-26 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-26 Amendment HA 1 to SB 11 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-19 Amendment HA 1 to SB 11 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2018-06-07 Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House
2018-06-06 Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 2 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT
2018-05-09 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
2018-03-28 Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback