DE SB109 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]


Individuals who receive health care via Medicaid deserve the same dedication to treatment of substance abuse disorders as individuals who receive health care via private insurance. This Act extends the same access to treatment of a substance use disorder within the Medicaid framework that Senate Bill 41 of the 149th General Assembly afforded to individuals covered by private health insurance, except that a 72 hour supply instead of 5 day supply of emergency medication is required. This Act also clarifies that Medicaid health plans must use the full set of American Society of Addiction Medicine criteria when determining whether medical necessity exists for the placement, continued stay, and transfer/discharge of patients with a substance use disorder in treatment programs. Additionally, this Act aligns protections relating to services, specifically 5 days of treatment in detox centers and 30 days of treatment in Intensive Outpatient Programs, with the residential treatment option that is protected pursuant to Senate Bill 41 of the 149th General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


An Act To Amend Title 18 And Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Coverage For Serious Mental Illness And Drug And Alcohol Dependency.


Roll Calls

2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]


2017-09-29 Signed by Governor
2017-07-02 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-06-14 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2017-06-13 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-06 Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources

Bill Comments