DE SB107 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill changes the standard of proof necessary to issue a civil gun relinquishment order from the Justice of the Peace Court. The preponderance of the evidence standard is the standard traditionally used in civil matters and is, therefore, appropriate here. This also makes the standard consistent with that required for a Lethal Violence Protective Order, which is highly similar in nature.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Civil Procedures To Relinquish Firearms Or Ammunition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 5 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2019-06-20 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2019-06-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-19 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 107 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-12 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 107 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Judicial Committee in Senate |