DE SB107 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act enables the Department of Health and Social Services to promulgate regulations allowing home health agencies and personal assistance services agencies to provide services in nursing facilities and hospitals. This change will allow consumers to receive the services necessary to safely achieve their highest level of independence and optimal quality of life while residing in their own home or during a necessary hospitalization.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Powers And Duties Of The Department Of Health And Social Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-23 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2015-06-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |