DE SB106 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill allows the Court to suspend an amount of the fine for uninsured driving if the defendant provides evidence that they have now secured insurance, demonstrating compliance with the law.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Requirement Of Insurance For All Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-20 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2019-06-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate |