DE SB105 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends Section 938 of Title 5 of the Delaware Code to permit the transfer of fiduciary accounts that are administered in the State of Delaware by a banking organization or trust company that has a place of business in the State of Delaware, but not its principal place of business in the State of Delaware, to an affiliated banking organization or trust company in the State of Delaware. Such a transfer would require the written approval of the State Bank Commissioner and the same notice procedure to interested persons as is required for any other transfer of fiduciary accounts permitted by Section 938.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 9, Title 5 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Transfer Of Fiduciary Accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-25 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 9 On Its Merits |
2015-06-09 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (BANKING AND BUSINESS) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Assigned to Banking and Business Committee in Senate |