DE SB104 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act clarifies various aspects of the States procedures to operate its unclaimed property program, including promoting and determining holder compliance, processing owner claims, and preventing fraudulent claims.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 12 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Unclaimed Property.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Sen. Kyle Gay [D] | Rep. William Bush [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] |
Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Spiegelman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-23 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-19 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |
2021-05-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2021-05-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-04-14 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate |