DE SB104 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill clarifies that Probation Before Judgment (PBJ) may be entered for multiple charges arising from a single arrest. Changes to the legislation also allow for a defendant to be permitted Probation Before Judgment more than once in a five year period so long as offenses are in different titles of the Code. For example, a defendant who was granted PBJ in 2017 for speeding (title 21) would be eligible for PBJ on a title 11 charge (e.g. bad check) or title 4 (e.g. underage consumption of alcohol) in 2019.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Probation Before Judgment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-20 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2019-06-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-19 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 104 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-13 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 104 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Judicial Committee in Senate |